Dogfen lywodraethu ST MARYLEBONE ALMSHOUSES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES OF THE CHARITY 14 APRIL 1931 AS AMENDED 5 OCTOBER 1965. SEE U.V.34 P.394 AND SCHEME OF THE 14TH MARCH 1980 AND RULES AMENDED 1 OCTOBER 1991, 13 JANUARY 1992 AND 2 MARCH 1992 as amended on 23 Sep 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROVIDE INDIVIDUAL HOMES WITHIN A COMMUNITY FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE REACHED RETIRING AGE AND CANNOT OTHERWISE AFFORD TO LIVE IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF ST MARYLEBONE AND WHO (OR, IN THE CASE OF A WIDOWED PERSON, WHOSE DECEASED SPOUSE) HAVE LIVED OR CARRIED ON BUSINESS OR BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF ST MARYLEBONE OR IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER FOR NOT LESS THAN TEN YEARS OR WHO, WHILE NOT EXACTLY COMPLYING WITH THE FOREGOING CONDITIONS, IN THE OPINION OF THE BOARD OF MANAGEMENT, HAVE SUFFICIENT CONNECTION WITH ST MARYLEBONE OR THE CITY OF WESTMINSTER AND ARE FIT AND PROPER PERSONS IN SUFFICIENT NEED TO BE ADMITTED AS RESIDENTS.
Maes buddion
ST MARYLEBONE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.