Dogfen lywodraethu EAST KENT MENCAP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 DECEMBER 1979, 13 APRIL 1989, 7 MARCH 2002, 10 JULY 2003, A SCHEME OF 26 JANUARY 2004 AND RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 JULY 2007 AND 24 JULY 2008 AS AMENDED 17 OCTOBER 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE RELIEF OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND FOR THEIR FAMILIES, DEPENDANTS AND CARERS, AND TO PROMOTE LEARNING DISABILITIES AND CULTURAL DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. "LEARNING DISABILITY" MEANS ANY DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED AND WHETHER MILD, MODERATE OR SEVERE.
Maes buddion
ISLE OF THANET.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.