WELSH NATIONAL OPERA LIMITED

Charity number: 221538
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.61m £10.65m £0 N/A £10.66m
Other income £7.14m £7.36m £17.29m £16.87m £7.95m
Total expenditure £17.53m £17.61m £18.99m £18.11m £20.91m