WELSH NATIONAL OPERA LIMITED

Charity number: 221538
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Samuel Barnaby Jones Trustee 15 February 2019 None on record
Henry Little Trustee 15 February 2019
BRIXTON CHAMBER ORCHESTRA
Yvette Anne Vaughan Jones Chair 09 October 2019 None on record
Andrew James Miller MBE Trustee 15 February 2019
THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND Charity reporting is up to date
CYNGOR CELFYDDYDAU CYMRU Charity reporting is up to date
Manon Edwards Ahir Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
Lynne Berry Trustee 24 October 2019 None on record
Aileen Richards Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
ELEN AP ROBERT Trustee 11 December 2014 None on record
Matthew Dada Trustee 25 February 2017 None on record
Martyn Ryan Trustee 27 February 2017
THE CARDIFF BLUES REGIONAL BENEVOLENT TRUST
THE TOM MAYNARD TRUST Charity reporting is up to date
THE CARDIFF BLUES COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
Daniel Evans Trustee 11 December 2014
NORTHERN BALLET LIMITED Charity reporting is up to date
Dr Chitra Bharucha Trustee 22 October 2019 None on record
Nicola Clare Amery Trustee 22 October 2019
CARDIFF MET STUDENTS' UNION Charity reporting is up to date