THE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS

Charity number: 225922
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 25 November 2016 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 03 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 03 December 2015 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)