Dogfen lywodraethu SAILORS' SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEM AND ARTS OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 DECEMBER 1905 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 1999, 6 DECEMBER 2007 AND 22 SEPTEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY CERTS OF INCORP ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 OCTOBER 1925 AND 29 MARCH 1995. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 OCT 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO BENEFIT SEAFARERS, EX-SEAFARERS AND INTENDING SEAFARERS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS AND THE COMMUNITIES IN WHICH THOSE PEOPLE LIVE OR WORK BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE BY SUCH WAYS AND MEANS AS THE CHARITY SHALL THINK FIT AND FOR SUCH PURPOSES TO DO ALL SUCH LAWFUL THINGS AS ARE NECESSARY TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE FOREGOING OBJECTS. .
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.