Dogfen lywodraethu BURNHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 1966 AMENDED 28 JUNE 1982, 24 NOVEMBER 1994, 23 JUNE 2005 AND 22 JUNE 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE CIVIL PARISH OF BURNHAM AND ITS IMMEDIATE DISTRICT, HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT", AND , IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. (II) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER THE COUNCIL REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
CIVIL PARISH OF BURNHAM AND ITS IMMEDIATE DISTRICT
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.