Dogfen lywodraethu CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSING SUPPORT FUND (EAST NORTH AND WEST YORKSHIRE)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
AIMS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED 12 NOVEMBER 1981, 21ST MAY 1996, 25TH JUNE 2002, 28TH NOVEMBER 2002 AND 26 MARCH 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A)TO ENABLE CHRISTIAN SCIENTISTS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION TO BE CARED FOR IN THEIR OWN HOMES OR AT AN ACCREDITED CHRISTIAN SCIENCE HOUSE, BY QUALIFIED CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSES. (B) TO OFFER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PATIENTS WHO ARE UNABLE TO PAY THE FEES OF THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSE OR HOUSE EITHER IN WHOLE OR IN PART. (C)TO ENCOURAGE AND PROMOTE THE TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE NURSES BY FINANCIAL AND OTHER MEANS CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEEDS. (D)TO MAINTAIN A SUPPLY OF APPROPRIATE EQUIPMENT FOR LOAN TO PATIENTS
Maes buddion
EAST NORTH AND WEST YORKSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.