Dogfen lywodraethu MISSION WITHOUT BORDERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH AUGUST 1972 AS AMENDED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1975, 11TH JULY 1984, 20TH SEPTEMBER 1992, 30 MAY 2006 AND 19 SEPTEMBER 2014.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE AND PROCLAIM THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD. TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE SUFFERING THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY OR OPPRESSION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WITHOUT REGARD TO THEIR RELIGIOUS OR ETHNIC BACKGROUNDS. TO HELP SUPPORT AND CARE FOR CHILDREN IN NEED AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN ORPHANED OR ABANDONED OR WHO HAVE BEEN PLACED IN INSTITUTIONS
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.