Dogfen lywodraethu NORFOLK HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 JAN 1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 FEB 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12 SEP 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 DEC 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE, WHATEVER OF THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK IN THE FORM OF (A) BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY BUILDING AS DEFINED IN SECTION 290 (1) OF THE TOWN AND COUNTRY PLANNING ACT 1971) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST; (B) ANCIENT MONUMENTS; (C) LAND OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL INTEREST.
Maes buddion
COUNTY OF NORFOLK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.