Trustees THE LIONEL ABEL-SMITH TRUST
Charity number: 274879
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GWENLAIS MARY WILLIAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sheila Elizabeth Bulpett | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Harrington | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Bishop | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
John William Mayhead CBE | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Robert Hugh Duggan | Trustee | 01 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Cllr Steve Bowles | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
MARION PATRICIA CLAYTON | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SARAH PAMELA POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WENDY RUTH GRAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.