Dogfen lywodraethu THE RANK FOUNDATION LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 FEB 1953 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 16 MAY 1955, 31 OCT 1978, 5 DEC 2002, 4 MAR 2004, 9 DEC 2009 AND 1 DEC 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) THE PROMOTION, BY MEANS OF THE EXHIBITION OF RELIGIOUS FILMS, OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, CHRISTIAN RELIGIOUS EDUCATION AND THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (B) THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY ANY OTHER LAWFUL MEANS. (C) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION. (D) THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND IN FORCE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.