THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR MISSION STUDIES

Charity number: 290112
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £1.24m £1.32m £1.26m £1.09m £1.14m
Total expenditure £1.29m £1.19m £1.13m £1.05m £1.09m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £480.44k £572.99k £484.67k £368.98k £335.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £762.43k £745.69k £769.72k £719.52k £805.17k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £506 £767 £156 £363 £1.24k
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.45k £405 £2.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £1.18m £1.13m £1.05m £1.09m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £12.05k £6.27k £3.52k £3.18k
Expenditure - Governance £12.32k £11.59k £11.20k £12.35k £33.13k
Expenditure - Grants institution £8.30k £8.30k £6.00k £5.00k £5.95k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £8.30k £0 £0 £0 £0