THE SERPENTINE TRUST

Charity number: 298809
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £75.77k
Income from government grants £1.19m £0 N/A £1.19m £1.20m
Other income £6.90m £9.40m £8.79m £8.42m £9.87m
Total expenditure £8.38m £9.56m £9.11m £10.12m £10.50m