Dogfen lywodraethu THE EWELME EXHIBITION FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEMES DATED 8 AUGUST 1899, 31 JANUARY 1930 AND 14 MARCH 1956 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 8 AUGUST 1986 AND 25 JUNE 1998
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES. B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS. C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR RECREATION AND SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING. D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE BENEFICIARIES TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS.
Maes buddion
THE PARISH OF EWELME
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.