Dogfen lywodraethu THE GORDON FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 1888 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 6 JULY 1892, 26 JANUARY 1989 AND 29TH JANUARY 1994 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF COMMISSIONERS OF 6TH SEPTEMBER 1995. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JAN 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO EDUCATE OR CONTRIBUTE TO THE EDUCATION OF BOYS AND GIRLS HAVING PARTICULAR REGARD TO THOSE WITH A SPECIFIC BOARDING OR EDUCATIONAL NEED, WITH A VIEW TO FITTING THEM FOR FURTHER EDUCATION OR FOR EARNING THEIR LIVELIHOOD, SUCH OBJECT BEING IN CONTINUATION OF THE WORK OF THE UNINCORPORATED INSTITUTION KNOWN AS THE GORDON BOYS' HOME, ESTABLISHED IN JULY 1885 AS A NATIONAL MEMORIAL TO GENERAL GORDON.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.