Dogfen lywodraethu BRITISH MEDICAL AND DENTAL STUDENTS' TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 MARCH 1960 AMENDED BY DEED DATED 2 APRIL 1964, SCHEMES DATED 3 JANUARY 1979 AND 4 AUGUST 1988, DEED DATED 7 JULY 1988 AND MINUTES DATED 12 OCTOBER 1988 AS AMENDE BY DEED OF VARIATION 30 SEPTEMBER 1994
Gwrthrychau elusennol
PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF MEDICAL EDUCATION BY CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS EXPENSES OF VISITS BY MEDICAL/DENTAL STUDENTS TO HOSPITAL OR OTHER MEDICAL OR DENTAL INSTITUTION OUTSIDE GREAT BRITAIN, OR EXPENSES OF ATTENDANCES AT CONFERENCES ETC, OR EXPENSES OF MEDICAL OR DENTAL RESEARCH OUTSIDE GREAT BRITAIN
Maes buddion
GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.