Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH DEER SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23 DECEMBER 1997. AS AMENDED ON 09 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 16 JUN 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 MAY 2012 as amended on 12 Jun 2023 as amended on 12 Jun 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects (‘Objects’) are: 4.1. The promotion in the public interest of research into the habits of and the scientific study of deer and, as appropriate, other feral or free-ranging ungulates in the British Isles (United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland, the Isle of Man and the Channel Islands) with particular reference to their relationship to the natural habitat, forestry, agriculture and areas to which the public have access 4.2. The promotion in the public interest of knowledge of methods of management, humane treatment and humane control of deer and, as appropriate, other feral or free-ranging ungulates
Maes buddion
BRITISH ISLES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.