Dogfen lywodraethu LAKELAND ARTS SUPPORT TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 MAR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF FUNDING FOR THE FACILITIES OF LAKELAND ARTS SPECIFICALLY, ABBOT HALL AND THE MUSEUM OF LAKELAND LIFE AND INDUSTRY IN KENDAL, CUMBRIA SO LONG AS IT REMAINS A REGISTERED CHARITY (NO: 1153001) AND SO LONG AS IT REMAINS IN EXISTENCE TO THE INTENT THAT IF LAKELAND ARTS IS NO LONGER A REGISTERED CHARITY OR NO LONGER EXISTS, OR IF IT SHALL CEASE TO OPERATE ABBOT HALL ART GALLERY IN KENDAL, THIS COMPANY SHALL BE WOUND-UP.
Maes buddion
KENDAL, CUMBRIA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.