Dogfen lywodraethu NOCN
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/08/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/02/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUL 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS; 1 BY PROMOTING AND WIDENING PARTICIPATION IN EDUCATION AND TRAINING, INCLUDING FOR THOSE PEOPLE WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN EXCLUDED FROM EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES; 2 BY IMPROVING THE QUALITY AND FLEXIBILITY OF EDUCATIONAL PROVISION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING FOR THOSE PEOPLE WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN EXCLUDED FROM EDUCATIONAL OPPORTUNITIES; AND 3 BY IMPROVING ACCESS TO LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITATING PROGRESSION TO FURTHER LEARNING, EMPLOYMENT AND HIGHER EDUCATION PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE AWARDS OF CREDITS AND CREDIT-BASED QUALIFICATIONS
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.