Dogfen lywodraethu THE GARDEN MUSEUM
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 FEBRUARY 1979, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 25 APRIL 2001, 27 JULY 2001, 20 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 9 DECEMBER 2008.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS, AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR: 1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE STUDY AND TEACHING OF GARDENING AND ITS HISTORY; 2. THE REINSTATEMENT, REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCHYARD OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN LAMBETH AND LAND ADJOINING OR ADJACENT THERETO AS A GARDEN OR OPEN SPACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 3. THE REPAIR AND PRESERVATION OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN LAMBETH, AND TO FINANCE THE USE OF IT FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
LAMBETH, LONDON, AND ELSEWHERE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.