Dogfen lywodraethu TURNER'S HOUSE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/11/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 APR 2017 as amended on 22 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
• to advance education in the arts for the benefit of the public by the preservation and conservation of Sandycombe Lodge, 40 Sandycoombe Road, Twickenham, Middlesex TW1 2LR as a monument to the artist Joseph Mallord William Turner and by owning and managing a collection and operating a museum based on works of and related to Joseph Mallord William Turner.
Maes buddion
SANDYCOMBE LODGE, SANDYCOMBE ROAD, TWICKENHAM, MIDDLESEX.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.