Dogfen lywodraethu HOME-START MANCHESTER
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JUL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 JAN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 NOV 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 DEC 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A. TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; B. TO PREVENT CRUELTY OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; C. TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; D. TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN MANCHESTER.
Maes buddion
MANCHESTER WYTHENSHAWE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.