Trustees BRAINTREE DISTRICT MUSEUM TRUST
Charity number: 1110447

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Wisbey | Chair | 28 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joseph DiVanna | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Power | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Turner PhD | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Louise Pavid | Trustee | 26 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jean Harrison | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Henry Thomas Price | Trustee | 24 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Demetra Cecilia Lindsay | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.