Dogfen lywodraethu KINGSTON CENTRE FOR INDEPENDENT LIVING
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/05/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2013 as amended on 06 Sep 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity's objects (the Objects) are; (i) For the public benefit, to promote social inclusion among disabled people who are or may be socially excluded due to disability, so that they can lead independent and empowering lives: ? meeting and facilitating the support needs of disabled people in the region; ? promoting and increasing the opportunities for independent living available to disabled people in the region; ? assisting disabled people to make choices and access the services and support they may require to live and work independently in the community with appropriate support; ? supporting and empowering disabled people so that they may carry out social, volunteering and employment roles.
Maes buddion
GREATER LONDON
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.