Dogfen lywodraethu DISCOVERING OLD WELSH HOUSES GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 22/07/2015 as amended on 24 Jul 2023 as amended on 21 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS') ARE (1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL (AND PARTICULARLY AMONGST PROFESSIONAL AND AMATEUR HISTORIANS, ARCHITECTS AND ARCHAEOLOGISTS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES) ON THE SUBJECT OF PRE-1700 BUILDINGS IN NORTH WALES, WHERE POSSIBLE USING DENDROCHRONOLOGY (TREE RING DATING); (2) AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF SUCH BUILDINGS BY VOLUNTEERS AND SPECIALISTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT; (3) AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.