Dogfen lywodraethu Right to Succeed CIO
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 13 MAR 2015 AMENDED ON 30 OCT 2017 as amended on 08 Jul 2020 as amended on 09 Jul 2020 as amended on 26 Jul 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANY PURPOSE OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT WITH A NON-EXCLUSIVE FOCUS ON THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE, PARTICULARLY THOSE FROM DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION BY: A) PROVIDING EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT TO SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE; AND B) PROVIDING SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PEOPLE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.