Trustees NEUADD BENTREF LLANUWCHLLYN
Charity number: 524294

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUW A EDWARDS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Branwen Haf Williams | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Osian Huw Williams | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 24 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nest Wyn Luck | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Parchg Carwyn Leonard Sidney Siddall | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sion Aran Jones | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
SION LLEWELYN | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|||||
Iolo Gwyn Jones | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWINA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.