Dogfen lywodraethu St James Dudley Foundation
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 17/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 10/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 16/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 26 JUL 2017 as amended on 26 Jul 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ASSISTING THE GOVERNORS OF THE CASTLE HIGH SCHOOL TO MEET THEIR STATUTORY OBLIGATIONS WITH REGARD TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1988 AND SUBJECT THERETO TO ANY SURPLUS INCOME IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: 1) IN AWARDING PRIZES TO PUPILS 2) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING SPECIAL BENEFITS FOR THE SCHOOL 3) IN PROMOTING IN OTHER WAYS THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN ATTENDING THE SCHOOL WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE 4) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO HAVE ATTENDED THE SCHOOL AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.