Dogfen lywodraethu ROUGEMONT SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/07/1974 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/1977 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/09/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/12/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN CONNECTION THEREWITH TO CONDUCT CARRY ON ACQUIRE AND DEVELOP IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ANY BOARDING OR DAY SCHOOL OR SCHOOLS FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OF EITHER SEX OR BOTH SEXES.
Maes buddion
NEWPORT, GWENT, AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.