Trustees ANNE FRANK TRUST UK
Charity number: 1003279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Josephine Cobbold | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Sarah Brooks Barnett | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aretha Banton | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Wayland | Trustee | 28 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Jeffrey Kriek | Trustee | 03 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mike Bettles | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Uzma Zahid | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD HOWARD | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIC ABRAMS | Trustee | 14 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.