Trustees BONE RESEARCH SOCIETY
Charity number: 1018837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr GUDRUN STENBECK | Trustee | 18 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Scott Roberts | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Edwards | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Celia Gregson | Trustee | 06 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Louise Stephen | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Alison Gartland | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Curtis | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amy Naylor | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Janet Brown | Trustee | 30 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kathryn Anna Ward | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.