Trustees THE BUBBLE FOUNDATION UK
Charity number: 1024552
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wilfred Thomas Gaffney | Chair | 07 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Slatter | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hodgson | Trustee | 22 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Matthew Clark | Trustee | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Philip Simpson | Trustee | 18 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ian Brown | Trustee | 18 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
Neil Stotesbury | Trustee | 28 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW LYNCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JOHN GRAHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR ANDY GENNERY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Sir Alan William Craft | Trustee |
|
||||||
Prof Andrew James Cant | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.