Trustees SPITAL CHARITY AND THE DE ASTON SCHOOL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1027193
Charity reporting is overdue by 586 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY NEAL | Chair | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Katie Barrow | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Naseby | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Shaw | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tim Grummell | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Fairhall | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Randall | Trustee | 04 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev ANDREW HAWES | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Helen Crooks | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Dring | Trustee | 16 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Young | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tom White | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henry Milburn Talbot | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
SIMON PORTER | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.