Trustees 12TH LEAMINGTON (HOLY TRINITY) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 1031305
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL WYNNE | Chair | 02 January 2012 |
|
|||||
Rev Esther Peers | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jade Francesca Robbins | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lewis James Morgan | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Robin Hosking | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
HARRY JAMES ROBBINS | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH WYLIE | Trustee | 09 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WYNNE | Trustee | 02 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM ROBBINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr GRAHAM RICHARD MARTIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID HENRY CROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.