Trustees THE LORD MAYOR OF BIRMINGHAM'S CHARITY
Charity number: 1036968
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Goldstein CBE DL | Chair | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Kenneth Wood | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Chaman Lal | Trustee | 23 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Loughran | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Carmen Watson | Trustee | 17 May 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Jonathan Hunt | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Diane Donaldson | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Michael Leddy | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Anne Kennedy | Trustee | 08 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.