Trustees THAXTED CHURCH TRUST
Charity number: 1042077
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Logue | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Elcombe | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Till | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev Christopher Brown | Trustee | 23 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE COMPAGNONI | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETRINA MARGARET MAWER | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
TOM WILSON | Trustee | 13 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Gerwyn Hugh Capon | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE MUNRO | Trustee |
|
||||||
JOAN AMY HOLLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.