Governing document ST PAUL'S HOSTEL
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 12/01/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/07/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/03/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/02/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/03/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER INDIVIDUALLY OR GENERALLY PERSONS IN THE WORCESTER AREA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
WORCESTER AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.