Governing document THE DEVON AND DORSET MILITARY MUSEUMS CHARITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 09/12/2003 AS AMENDED ON 01/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 20/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 11/05/2012 as amended on 09 Dec 2003
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE PARTICIPATING REGIMENTS IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THOSE REGIMENTS AND THE MILITARY HISTORY OF DEVON AND DORSET; AND (2) TO PROMOTE MILITARY EFFICIENCY AND ENCOURAGE RECRUITMENT; BY THE PRESERVATION AND PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.