Dogfen lywodraethu THE WOMEN'S ROYAL ARMY CORPS ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATING QUEEN MARY'S ARMY AUXILIARY CORPS AND AUXILIARY TERRITORIAL SERVICE COMRADES ASSOCIATION)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
RULES ADOPTED 01/07/1950 AS AMENDED ON 13/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 04/11/2002 AS AMENDED ON 02/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 10/07/2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMY BY: (A) MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN FORMER MEMBERS OF QUEEN MARY'S ARMY AUXILIARY CORPS (QMAAC), THE AUXILIARY TERRITORIAL SERVICE (ATS), THE AUXILIARY TERRITORIAL SERVICE TERRITORIAL ARMY (ATS TA), WOMEN'S ROYAL ARMY CORPS (WRAC), WOMEN'S ROYAL ARMY CORPS TERRITORIAL ARMY (WRAC TA), WRAC TERRITORIAL AND VOLUNTEER RESERVE (WRAC TAVR) AND WOMEN STILL SERVING IN THE ARMY, FOSTERING MUTUAL FRIENDSHIP BETWEEN THEM AND PROVIDING FOR SOCIAL GATHERINGS. (B) FOSTERING ESPRIT DE CORPS, COMRADESHIP, WELFARE AND PRESERVING THE TRADITIONS OF THE QMAAC, THE ATS, THE ATS TA, THE WRAC, WRAC TA, AND WRAC TAVR."
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.