Dogfen lywodraethu THE ROYAL NAVAL BENEVOLENT TRUST (GRAND FLEET AND KINDRED FUNDS)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 2ND MAY 1922, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTERS DATED 13TH DECEMBER 1957, 29TH JANUARY 1959,13TH NOVEMBER 1973, 13 APRIL 1981, 8 JULY 2009 AND 13 DECEMBER 2017.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROVIDE RELIEF IN CASES OF NECESSITY OR DISTRESS TO THOSE WHO HAVE SERVED OR ARE SERVING IN OUR NAVAL FORCES.2) TO MAKE PROVISION OF TRAINING FOR SUCH PERSONS FOR CIVIL LIFE AND ASSISTANCE IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY OBTAIN SUITABLE EMPLOYMENT ON LEAVING THE SERVICE.3) TO MAKE CONTRIBUTION TO THE CARE, TRAINING, MAINTENANCE AND WELFARE OF THE FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS OF SUCH PERSONS IN CASES OF NECESSITY AND DISTRESS.
Maes buddion
ENGLAND & WALES, SCOTLAND AND OVERSEAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.