Governance ROYAL COMMONWEALTH SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Charity number: 207544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 22 September 1962: Standard registration
- 02 February 2017: Funds received from 326895 THE THIRD WORLD TRUST
- 16 February 2017: Funds received from 1126378 CEDARA BLIND FOUNDATION
- 21 December 2020: Funds received from 285872 VOLUNTEERS FOR RURAL INDIA
- 15 February 2021: Funds received from 1021780 STANLEY CLAYTON TRUST
- 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
- 15 November 2022: Funds received from 515204 WREXHAM AND DISTRICT PHAB CLUB
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- SIGHT SAVERS (Working name)
- SIGHTSAVERS (Working name)
- SIGHTSAVERS INTERNATIONAL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.