Trustees THE ROYAL AGRICULTURAL BENEVOLENT INSTITUTION
Charity number: 208858
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WILLIAM STANLEY | Chair | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robert Parry | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Hugh Christopher Saxton | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Leilliott | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Caroline Overton | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Herrod | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Vivian Delme HARRIES | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|||||
JEAN WOOLLISCROFT | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUE LISTER | Trustee | 05 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR JOHN HOSKIN | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES BINNING | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.