Trustees ROYAL ASIATIC SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Charity number: 209629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROFESSOR SARAH ANSARI | Chair | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Weipin Tsai | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Susan Whitfield | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Priyanka Basu | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Francis Robinson | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Blurton | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rosie Llewellyn-Jones | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Francois de Blois | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Deborah Swallow | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sanjoy Bhattacharya | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Sedgwick | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Willis | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Annabel Teh Gallop | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Elizabeth Driver | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr BARBARA BREND | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Robb | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gordon Johnson | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|||||
LIONEL KNIGHT | Trustee | 12 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.