Trustees LEE'S REST HOUSES
Charity number: 221523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Horsley | Chair | 01 November 2004 |
|
|
||||
Karen Woods | Trustee | 16 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Nicholson | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Luffingham | Trustee | 02 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAMES CHRISTOPHER NEEDLER | Trustee | 09 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
NEIL RISEHAM | Trustee | 14 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEVIN SIMON WEBSTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS ANN BOOTH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.