Governing document CROUCHFIELD TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 10 FEBRUARY 1989 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 23 OCTOBER 1990, 15 JULY 1992, AND 2 AUGUST 1994, ORDER DATED 19 JULY 2004, AMENDMENT PASSED 6 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF AND PROVISION OF CARE FACILITIES INCLUDING ACCOMMODATION APPROPRIATE TO THEIR NEEDS FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS WHO ARE DELINQUENT, NEGLECTED, ILL TREATED AND IN NEED OF CARE OR EXPOSED TO MORAL DANGER.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.