Trustees GREENWICH CHARITY OF WILLIAM HATCLIFFE AND THE MISSES SMITH
Charity number: 227721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER ANTHONY HOUGH | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
Jeremy David Hasse Holland | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Cllr Christine St Matthew-Daniel | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Councillor Majidur Rahman | Trustee | 26 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Simon Winn | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|||||||
Cllr Patricia Slattery | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Kevin Seton-Clements | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Christine Melville | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||||
HELEN MCINTOSH | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||||
MALCOLM DAVID REID | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|||||||
GREGORY JAMES KIRBY MBA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ANDREW CHARLES BLUNDY | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.