Trustees THE COVENTRY FREEMEN'S CHARITY
Charity number: 229237
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Gordon Rosier | Chair | 26 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Steven John Rawson | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Raj Bansal | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Wilkinson | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID MANDER | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||||
GEORGE WILKINSON | Trustee | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID BULLMAN | Trustee | 14 September 2015 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL RAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
DAVID MASON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MR DAVID HANDFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
JAMES PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.