Governing document WEAVERHAM AND ACTON BRIDGE TRUST
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 13 JUNE 1924, 25 JULY 1930 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1961 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS UNDER S74(2)(C) & (D) OF 3 JUNE 2000 AND AS AMENDED 13 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WHO SUPPORT ACTIVITIES FOR ALL YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE PARISHES OF WEAVERHAM AND ACTON BRIDGE, TO PROVIDE GRANTS OF MONEY FOR THEIR ACTIVITIES WHERE THEY BENEFIT THE YOUNG PEOPLE COLLECTIVELY IN PURSUIT OF THE CHARITY'S OBJECTIVE
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WEAVERHAM AND ACTON BRIDGE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.