Trustees THE ST ALBANS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Charity number: 248887
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive Bell | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Michael Taylor | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Edward DAVID Roberts | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Rev Christopher Edward Bunce | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Rev Andrew John Thomas | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Rev Kaushal David | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Rev CHARLES EDWARD CAMERON HUDSON | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Andrew Charles Brown | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Bruce Crawford | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Rev David John Middlebrook | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Kenneth Alan Ebbage | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
The Revd Canon Peter Michael Ackroyd | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Mary Eryl Butcher | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Nigel Kenneth Challis | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Mark William Eaton | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
David Checkley Clark | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Reverend Doctor Graham Robert Cappleman | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
THE VENERABLE J MACKENZIE, THE ARCHDEACON OF HERTFORD | Trustee | 06 September 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
Patricia Elizabeth Easterbrook | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Kerry Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Martyn John Gates | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Philip Richard Lindley | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
TIMOTHY RUSSELL FLEMING | Trustee | 04 July 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
MR J W BUTLER | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
MR C B GAGE | Trustee | 15 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
DR D W DALLINGER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||
DR R SOUTHERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||||||||
COLIN GRAHAM BIRD | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||||||||||
RT REVD DR ALAN GREGORY CLAYTON SMITH BA MA PHD | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.